CA AB2463 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Delgado.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Delgado.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12100.62 of the Government Code, relating to economic development.
Title
California Small Business Development Technical Assistance Expansion Act of 2018.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2463 QUIRK-SILVA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2463 QUIRK-SILVA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Delgado. |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2018-08-16 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Delgado. |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5473.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25). |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17). |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12100.60 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12100.62 | Amended Code | Citation Text |