CA AB2463 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-12 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-12 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8210, 8211, 8212, 8214, 8215, and 8216 of, to add Sections 8212.5, 8215.5, and 8218 to, and to repeal Section 8212.3 of, the Education Code, relating to child care and development services.
Title
Child care resource and referral programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-09 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2463 BROWNLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2463 BROWNLEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-12 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2010-08-09 | In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2010-08-03 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-08-02 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 30). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-10 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-06-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-06-02 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 5509.) | |
2010-06-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-28 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2010-04-28 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-04-14 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 13). | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |