CA AB2459 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 100504.1 to the Government Code, and to add and repeal Section 17052.10 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal income taxes: credits: health insurance premiums.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2459 FRIEDMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Revenue and Taxation] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2018-08-13SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-08-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-05-31SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5486.)
2018-05-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-05-25AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5298.)
2018-05-23AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-16AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-05-15AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 14).
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2018-04-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HEALTH and REV. & TAX.
2018-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2018-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code100504.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17052.10New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback