CA AB2459 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 53114.3 to the Government Code, relating to emergency services.
Title
Local emergency telephone systems: appropriate use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2459 TORRES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2459 TORRES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-16 | In committee: Held under submission. | |
2012-07-02 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-06-19 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-07 | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | |
2012-05-29 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-29 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 5057.) | |
2012-05-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-04-18 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-04-10 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-15 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53114.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |