CA AB2457 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7360, 7362, 7363, and 7364 of, and to add Section 7374 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Motor Vehicle Fuel Tax Law: suspension of tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7360 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7362 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7363 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7364 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7374 | New Code | See Bill Text |