CA AB2457 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 102, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 2460 and 2499 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 2461 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to podiatry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Podiatry: Podiatric Medical Board of California.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2457 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - AB 2457 IRWIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-16 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 102, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-16 Approved by the Governor.
2018-07-10AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-07-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-07-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5040.).
2018-06-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-25SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-04-12SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-12AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4646.)
2018-04-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 4).
2018-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2018-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code101Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code115.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code116Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code130Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code144Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code159.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code1680Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code205Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2071Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code208Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2220.05Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2221.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2222Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2225Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2225.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2228Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2229Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2262Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2291Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2292Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2307Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2317Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2318Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2330Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2335Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2336Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2415Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2424Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2460Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2460.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2461Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2497.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2499Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2525.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2570.28Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2620.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2660Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2761Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2878Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3110Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code328Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3750Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4170Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4175Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4955Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code651Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code656Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code683Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code800Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code801.01Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code802.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code803.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code803.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code803.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code805Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code805.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code805.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code805.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code810Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code43.96Amended CodeCitation Text
Corporations Code13401Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code11435.15Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12529Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12529.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code11165.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code11362.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback