CA AB2456 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 14 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 8753 of the Government Code, relating to state government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Arts Council: peer review groups.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2456 Bloom By Allen (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2456 BLOOM Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-07-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-02SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-21SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5215.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
2018-03-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
2018-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2018-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code50028Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code8753Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback