CA AB2455 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 917, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1796.29 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to home care services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home care aide registry: disclosure of personal contact information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2455 KALRA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 47 N: 26 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2455 Kalra By Leyva (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2455 KALRA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 917, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-29 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-07AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 26. Page 6818.).
2018-08-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-24SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 5700.).
2018-08-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-28SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-27SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 26).
2018-06-13SenateReferred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2018-06-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 29. Page 5638.)
2018-05-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-30AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 24).
2018-03-20AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-03-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2018-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2018-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1796.29Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback