CA AB2453 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 25 @ 9:00 am Assembly Appropriations Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 17074.25 of the Education Code, and to add Section 44391.3 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Air pollution: schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23).
2018-04-17AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-04-16AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-12AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11).
2018-04-09Assembly(pending re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES.)
2018-04-09AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4554.)
2018-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-03-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Coms. on ED. and NAT. RES.
2018-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2018-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code17074.25Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code44391.3New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback