CA AB245 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 555, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 66271.4 to the Education Code, relating to educational equity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Educational equity: student records: name and gender changes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-30 - Assembly - AB 245 Chiu Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB245 Chiu et al. By Wiener (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - AB 245 Chiu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-06 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 555, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-06 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-02 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2021-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 1.).
2021-08-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-08-23SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 8.).
2021-08-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-07-15SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2021-07-08SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 1715.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-22SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-06-21SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 16).
2021-06-03SenateReferred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
2021-05-25SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-04-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 14).
2021-03-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-01-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2021-01-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 13.
2021-01-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code66271.4New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback