CA AB245 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-17 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
Pending: Senate Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-17 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
Pending: Senate Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Part 6.8 (commencing with Section 15375) of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to aerospace.
Title
California Aerospace and Aviation Commission: establishment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 245 Muratsuchi Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 245 Muratsuchi Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and G.O. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1923.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 2). |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2019-01-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 22. |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 15375 | New Code | See Bill Text |