CA AB2448 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 315, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 315, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 51.17 of the Civil Code, relating to civil rights.
Title
Civil rights: businesses: discrimination and harassment of customers: pilot program.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Asm. Matt Haney [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] | Asm. Mike Fong [D] |
Sen. Dave Min [D] | Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D] | Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2448 Ting Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2448 Ting et al. By Pan (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor, Public Employment and Retirement ] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2448 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Employment] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2448 Ting et al. By Pan (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor, Public Employment and Retirement ] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2448 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Employment] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 315, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5209.). |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L., P.E. & R. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and L., P.E. & R. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4992.) |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. & E. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 51.17 | New Code | See Bill Text |