CA AB2447 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 21092 of, and to add Chapter 2.8 (commencing with Section 21099.50) to Division 13 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to land use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Environmental Quality Act: land use: environmental justice.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2447 REYES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-13SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20).
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on EQ.
2018-05-31SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 26. Page 5554.)
2018-05-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 24).
2018-04-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2018-04-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-04-10AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-03-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and E.S. & T.M.
2018-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2018-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code21092Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code21099.50New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback