CA AB2445 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 145, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 122354.5 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health: retail sale of dogs, cats, and rabbits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2445 O'Donnell By Galgiani (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2445 O'DONNELL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-20 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 145, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-20 Approved by the Governor.
2018-07-10AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-07-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-07-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5045.).
2018-06-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18).
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-05-10SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5127.)
2018-05-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 8).
2018-05-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-05-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-04-05AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2018-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code122215Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code122354.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback