CA AB2442 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dodd.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dodd.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8680.3 and 8686.4 of the Government Code, relating to greenhouse gases.
Title
California Disaster Assistance Act: climate change.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2442 Robert Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2442 Robert Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dodd. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 29). |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-06-02 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on E.Q. | |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O., GOV. & F. and E.Q. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 10. Page 4924.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18). |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and NAT. RES. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8680.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8686.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |