CA AB2429 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 6.5 (commencing with Section 585) to Part 1 of Division 1 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurance: time-limited demands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 5800 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 585 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2429 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB2429 |