CA AB2429 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6591.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
State Board of Equalization: administration: interest.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6591.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2429&sess=1314&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_2401-2450/ab_2429_bill_20140221_introduced.html |