CA AB242 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 228, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 228, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 398.4, 854, 913.5, 913.6, 1701.8, and 3280 of, and to repeal Sections 913.2, 913.10, and 913.11 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to public utilities, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Public utilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-07 - Assembly - AB 242 Holden Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-09-03 - Senate - Special Consent AB242 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - AB 242 Holden Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-03 - Senate - Special Consent AB242 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - AB 242 Holden Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 228, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2840.). |
2021-09-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2388.). |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-23 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-06-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1532.) |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1464.) |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 21). |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 7). |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 13. |
2021-01-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 1701.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 3280 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 398.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 854 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 913.10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 913.11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 913.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 913.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 913.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |