CA AB242 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 23 @ 8:00 am in State Capitol, Room 437
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 6070.5 to the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 68088 of the Government Code, relating to implicit bias.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courts: attorneys: implicit bias: training.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-01AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-03-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-01-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 21.
2019-01-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code6070.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code68088Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback