CA AB2416 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1360.7 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] | Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D] | Asm. Autumn Burke [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Asm. Laura Friedman [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1360.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1365 | Amended Code | Citation Text |