CA AB2416 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-29 - Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
Pending: Assembly Public Employees, Retirement and Social Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-29 - Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
Pending: Assembly Public Employees, Retirement and Social Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 7504.1 to the Government Code, relating to public employees' retirement.
Title
Public employees' retirement systems: reserve funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 7504.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_2416&sess=1112&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_2401-2450/ab_2416_bill_20120224_introduced.html |