CA AB2415 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10072 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
Electronic benefits transfer system.
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2020-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10072 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2415 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2415 |