CA AB2411 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 42240, 42241, 42241.5, 42243, 42244, and 42245 of, and to add Sections 42241.3 and 42243.5 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solid waste: use of compost: planning.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2411 MCCARTY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-05-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-01AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-30AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23).
2018-04-02AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2018-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-05AssemblyReferred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and NAT. RES.
2018-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2018-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback