CA AB2410 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17941 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Annual tax: limited liability company small business.
Sponsors
Asm. Tim Grayson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17941 | Amended Code | Citation Text |