CA AB241 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 252, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 53760.9 to the Government Code, relating to local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bankruptcy: retired employees: disclosure of names and mailing addresses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-18 - Assembly - AB 241 GORDON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 65 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB241 Gordon By Wolk (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Assembly - AB 241 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Privacy and Consumer Protection (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 252, Statutes of 2016.
2016-09-09 Approved by the Governor.
2016-08-24AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m.
2016-08-18AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 11. Page 5876.).
2016-08-16AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2016-08-15SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 4960.).
2016-08-02SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-08-01SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2016-06-21SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2016-06-21SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-06-09SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-06-08SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8).
2016-06-01SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2016-02-04SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2016-01-27SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2016-01-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 14. Page 3502.)
2016-01-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-01-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (January 21).
2015-05-20AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2015-04-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-29AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2015-04-28AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 21).
2015-04-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2015-02-17AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and P. & C.P.
2015-02-06AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
2015-02-05AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code53760.9New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_241&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_bill_20150205_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_bill_20150429_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_bill_20160601_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_bill_20160609_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_bill_20160621_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_bill_20160819_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_bill_20160909_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20150408_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20150421_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20160121_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20160127_1240PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20160608_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20160815_0312PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20160818_1154AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback