CA AB241 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 316, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 19962 and 19963 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to gambling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gambling: moratorium.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB241 Hall By Calderon (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Assembly - AB 241 HALL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-09-26 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 316, Statutes of 2011.
2011-09-26 Approved by the Governor.
2011-09-07 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2011-08-31 In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2011-08-30 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 2164.).
2011-08-29 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-08-25 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (August 25).
2011-08-15 In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2011-06-28 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-06-08 Referred to Com. on G.O.
2011-05-31 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2011-05-31 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 1645.)
2011-05-27 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-05-04 In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2011-04-14 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-02-18 Referred to Com. on G.O.
2011-02-04 From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
2011-02-03 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code19962Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code19963Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_241&sess=1112&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_bill_20110203_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_bill_20110902_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_bill_20110926_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20110413_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20110527_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20110531_0147PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20110628_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20110815_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20110825_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20110830_0433PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback