CA AB241 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 597.8 to the Penal Code, relating to animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dogs and cats: breeding for sale.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-09-08 - Assembly - AB 241 NAVA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB241 Nava By Florez (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-14 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-21 - Assembly - AB 241 NAVA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business and Professions (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-01-14 Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
2009-10-26 Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2009-10-11 Vetoed by Governor.
2009-09-25 Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2009-09-08 Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 3091.)
2009-09-03 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2009-09-02 Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 2111.)
2009-08-25 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-08-24 Read third time, amended. To second reading.
2009-08-19 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-08-18 From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2009-07-23 From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 16). Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-07-16 Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1756.)
2009-07-01 In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2009-06-29 In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2009-06-23 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2009-06-22 In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2009-06-16 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2009-06-09 Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2009-06-04 Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S.
2009-05-21 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2009-05-21 Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 14. Page 1620.)
2009-05-18 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-05-14 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 13).
2009-04-29 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 28).
2009-04-15 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 14).
2009-04-13 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2009-03-09 Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and B. & P.
2009-02-11 From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
2009-02-10 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code597.8New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_241&sess=0910&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_bill_20090210_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_bill_20090413_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_bill_20090616_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_bill_20090623_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_bill_20090723_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_bill_20090824_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_bill_20090910_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20090414_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20090428_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20090513_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20090521_1136AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20090714_000005_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20090714_000006_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20090716_000007_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20090902_1159AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0201-0250/ab_241_vote_20090908_0418PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback