CA AB241 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 43018.9, 44060.5, 44125, 44270.3, 44271, 44272, and 44274 of, to add Sections 44272.1 and 44272.6 to, and to repeal Section 44272.4 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 9250.1 and 9261.1 of the Vehicle Code, relating to the air pollution, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Vehicular air pollution: Clean Transportation Program: vehicle registration and identification plate service fees: smog abatement fee: extension.
Sponsors
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D] | Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D] | Asm. Laura Friedman [D] | Asm. Luz Rivas [D] |
Asm. Chris Holden [D] | Asm. Corey Jackson [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Asm. Josh Lowenthal [D] |
Asm. Liz Ortega [D] | Asm. Rick Zbur [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-26 - Assembly - AB 241 Reyes Third Reading Urgency Amendment Set #1 (Y: 46 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | Died on inactive file. |
2023-09-14 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Reyes. |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Measure version as amended on June 26 corrected. |
2023-06-26 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 46. Noes 18. Page 2374.) |
2023-06-26 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 17. Page 2371.) |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18). |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.) |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES. |
2023-01-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 13. |
2023-01-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 43018.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44060.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44270.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44271 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44272 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44272.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44272.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44272.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44274 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 9250.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 9261.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |