CA AB2409 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 37 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professions and vocations: occupational regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
2018-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-04-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
2018-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2018-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code101.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code37New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback