CA AB2407 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 3 (commencing with Section 42450.5) of Chapter 8 of Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to recycling.
Title
Recycling: lithium-ion vehicle batteries: advisory group.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2407 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-06-12 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 5422.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25). |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2018-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42450.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |