CA AB2406 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 755, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 755, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 65852.22 to the Government Code, relating to housing, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Housing: junior accessory dwelling units.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2406 THURMOND Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2406 Thurmond By McGuire Urgency Cla (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - AB 2406 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2406 Thurmond By McGuire Urgency Cla (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - AB 2406 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 755, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6380.). |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5285.). |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-09 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2016-06-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4778.) |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 4). |
2016-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4448.) (pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.) |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65852.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65852.22 | New Code | See Bill Text |