CA AB2405 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1254.5 of, and to add Section 1250.12 to, the Health and Safety Code, and to add Article 3.5 (commencing with Section 4085.01) to Chapter 3 of Part 1 of Division 4 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to behavioral health facilities.
Title
Intensive behavioral health treatment facilities.
Sponsors
Asm. Chad Mayes [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1250.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1254.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4085.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |