CA AB2404 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5122 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.
Title
Mental health: involuntary commitment.
Sponsors
Asm. James Ramos [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2020-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5122 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2404 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2404 |