CA AB2402 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on INS.
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on INS.
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10102 of, and to repeal Section 10105 of, the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Residential property insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-26 - Assembly - AB 2402 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4602.) |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2020-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 10102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10105 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |