CA AB2402 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-07 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 26162.5 of, and to add Section 26161.5 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 56.06 of the Civil Code, relating to cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis: personal information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - AB 2402 LOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 5 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-20SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 18).
2018-06-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
2018-05-15SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 5. Page 5163.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (May 9).
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2018-04-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-04-09AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & P. and P. & C.P.
2018-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2018-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code26161.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code26162.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code56.06Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback