CA AB24 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 89013 to the Education Code, relating to the California State University.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California State University: feasibility study: Chula

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-09-09 - Assembly - AB 24 BLOCK Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB24 Block By Ducheny (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Assembly - AB 24 BLOCK Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-01-14 Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
2009-10-26 Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2009-10-11 Vetoed by Governor.
2009-09-28 Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
2009-09-09 Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3152.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 3156.)
2009-09-08 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2009-09-03 Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 4. Page 2160.)
2009-09-01 Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Corrected September 3.)
2009-08-31 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (August 27).
2009-08-17 In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
2009-07-23 From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 15). Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-07-07 In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2009-07-02 Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2009-07-01 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2009-06-18 Referred to Com. on RLS.
2009-06-03 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2009-06-02 Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 1942.)
2009-06-01 Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2009-05-29 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
2009-04-01 In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2009-03-18 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 17).
2009-03-03 In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2009-03-02 Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2009-02-26 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2009-02-05 Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2008-12-02 From printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
2008-12-01 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code89013New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_24&sess=0910&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_24_bill_20081201_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_24_bill_20090226_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_24_bill_20090601_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_24_bill_20090701_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_24_bill_20090723_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_24_bill_20090901_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_24_bill_20090911_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_24_vote_20090317_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_24_vote_20090528_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_24_vote_20090602_0304PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_24_vote_20090715_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_24_vote_20090817_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_24_vote_20090827_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_24_vote_20090903_1130AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ab_24_vote_20090909_1115AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback