CA AB2396 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 215, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 10413 to the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public contracting: conflicts of interest: exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-06 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2396 Bigelow (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2396 BIGELOW Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 215, Statutes of 2018.
2018-08-27 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-13AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-06SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5166.).
2018-07-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-07-02SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-21SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5215.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-11AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2018-03-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2018-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2018-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Contract Code10413New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Contract Code10430Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback