CA AB2393 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 77, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 77, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5709 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.
Title
Mental health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-21 - Assembly - AB 2393 HEALTH Concurrence in Senate Amendments By WOOD (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2393 HEALTH (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Assembly - AB 2393 HEALTH Consent Calendar Second Day By WOOD (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2393 HEALTH (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Assembly - AB 2393 HEALTH Consent Calendar Second Day By WOOD (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 77, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-07-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5927.). |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4664.). |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 6). |
2018-05-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4789.) |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5709 | Amended Code | Citation Text |