CA AB2391 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 84, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 84, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 391 and 391.1 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to domestic violence.
Title
Civil actions: vexatious litigants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-20 - Assembly - AB 2391 Cunningham Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2391 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Assembly - AB 2391 Cunningham Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB2391 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Assembly - AB 2391 Cunningham Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 84, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-07-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-06-29 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. | |
2022-06-20 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.). |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4265.). |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). |
2022-05-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4048.) |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 22). |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 391 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 391.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |