CA AB239 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8)
Status: Passed on September 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 192, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 23390 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Winegrowers and brandy manufacturers: exercise of privileges: locations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-01 - Assembly - AB 239 Villapudua Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB239 Villapudua et al. By Wiener (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 239 Villapudua Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-22 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 192, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-22 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-08 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2021-09-01AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.).
2021-09-01AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 16.)
2021-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2021-08-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-07-15SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-06-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-06-21SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2021-06-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-19SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2021-05-06SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-06AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1334.)
2021-04-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-04-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 28).
2021-04-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 22. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-01-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2021-01-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 13.
2021-01-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code23390Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback