CA AB2386 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-12 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-12 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 6 (commencing with Section 104559.6) to Chapter 1 of Part 3 of Division 103 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to tobacco.
Title
Tobacco: retailer disclosures.
Sponsors
Asm. Alex Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and TRANS. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 104559.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |