CA AB2386 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 44268.2 to the Education Code, relating to services credentialing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Services credentialing: services credential with a specialization in occupational therapy or physical therapy services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-01AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-30AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 25).
2018-04-11AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-04-10AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-21AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2018-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code44268.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code44270Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback