CA AB2382 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 16170 and 29805 of, to add Sections 16531 and 16532 to, and to add Article 6 (commencing with Section 30400), Article 7 (commencing with Section 30442), Article 8 (commencing with Section 30470), and Article 9 (commencing with Section 30485) to Chapter 1 of Division 10 of Title 4 of Part 6 of, the Penal Code, relating to firearms, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Firearms: firearm precursor parts.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2382 GIPSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2382 GIPSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 26). |
2018-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 29. Page 5652.) |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25). |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 16170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 16520 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 16531 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 16532 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 29805 | Amended Code | Citation Text |