CA AB2380 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 636, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Part 4.5 (commencing with Section 14865) to Division 12 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to fire protection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fire protection: privately contracted private fire prevention resources.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2380 Aguiar-Curry Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2380 Aguiar-Curry By Wiener (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 2380 AGUIAR-CURRY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-21 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 636, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-21 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-12AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
2018-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2018-08-31SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6139.).
2018-08-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-28SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-28SenateJoint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 5851.)
2018-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-07-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Coms. on G.O. and N.R. & W.
2018-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5421.)
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 25).
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-30AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23).
2018-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-04-16Assembly(pending re-referral to Com. on NAT. RES.)
2018-04-16AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4674.)
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-03-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Coms. on G.O. and NAT. RES.
2018-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2018-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code13050Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code14865New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback