CA AB238 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-20 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-20 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 11545 of, and to repeal Section 1662 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Unlicensed automobile dismantlers: enforcement and compliance activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Assembly - AB 238 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Assembly - AB 238 Santiago Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-20 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2020-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-09 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3935.) |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 23). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 21. |
2019-01-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 11545 | Amended Code | Citation Text |