CA AB238 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1714.27 to the Civil Code, and to add Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 19305) to Part 3 of Division 13 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to emergency response.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency response: trauma kits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 238 STEINORTH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-26SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
2018-02-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-02-21SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-02-21SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-02-21SenateFrom inactive file.
2017-09-12SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire.
2017-06-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19).
2017-06-01SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-05-18SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-18AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 1614.)
2017-05-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-11AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-05-10AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2017-05-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-04-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-04-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-27AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & P. and L. & E.
2017-01-31AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 2.
2017-01-30AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code19334.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code26105Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1714.27New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code19305New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback