CA AB2374 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 784, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 784, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 374.3 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Crimes against public health and safety: illegal dumping.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2374 Bauer-Kahan et al. By Glazer (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - AB 2374 Bauer-Kahan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - AB 2374 Bauer-Kahan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 784, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-23 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-08-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4871.). |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4707.) |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11). |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and B. & P. |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 374.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |