CA AB2371 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 867, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 867, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 7065.06 and 7195.5 to the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 65592, 65596, and 65596.5 of, and to add Section 65596.7 to, the Government Code, relating to water use efficiency.
Title
Water use efficiency: landscape irrigation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2371 CARRILLO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2371 Carrillo et al. By Glazer (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2371 CARRILLO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review] (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2371 Carrillo et al. By Glazer (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2371 CARRILLO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review] (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 867, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 23. Page 6852.). |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 5762.). |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 26). |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 18). |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and N.R. & W. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 28. Page 5651.) |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5363.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25). |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (April 10). |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on W.,P., & W. and A. & A.R. |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |