CA AB237 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 740, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 9.4 (commencing with Section 3140) to Division 4 of Title 1 of the Government Code, relating to public employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public employment: unfair practices: health protection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB237 Gray et al. By Cortese (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - AB 237 Gray Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 740, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-09 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-07 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2021-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 8.).
2021-08-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-16SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2021-07-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-05-27SenateReferred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
2021-05-18SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-04-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (April 28).
2021-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-16AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-03-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2021-03-01AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2021-01-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 13.
2021-01-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code3140New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback