CA AB237 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 94867.5, 94892.5, 94896.5, and 94939.5 to the Education Code, relating to private postsecondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Private postsecondary education: approval to operate: Title 38 awards.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-03AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2020-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2019-03-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2019-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-21AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and B. & P.
2019-01-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 21.
2019-01-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code94867.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code94892.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code94896.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code94939.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback